Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5127 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill October 9, 2024
Bill May 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill October 24, 2024

Chaptered

Bill October 30, 2024