House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 266'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/01/2023 11:32 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/30/2023 12:46 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/21/2023 10:10 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 585 Yeas 58 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 737 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Rep. Joseph Aragona Removed As Cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 448 Yeas 58 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/12/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Noah Arbit
|
|
|