Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill November 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 4, 2023