House | 12/31/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 12/31/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
House | 12/23/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 672 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 11/26/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 11/26/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Education | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 144 Yeas 56 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/26/2023 | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Introduced By Representative Matt Koleszar |