Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill December 20, 2024
Bill May 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025