House
|
11/13/2024
|
Assigned Pa 152'24
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/13/2024 01:28 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 11/13/2024 11:38 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 11/06/2024 10:04 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
10/30/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled Out Of Session 10/30/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Immediate Effect Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 394 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2024
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/02/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 311 Yeas 61 Nays 46 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/09/2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Jimmie Wilson
|
|
|