Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5328 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill October 30, 2024
Bill September 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill November 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill November 14, 2024