House | 12/10/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 470 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 155 Yeas 100 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Vote Reconsidered | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Defeated Roll Call # 28 Yeas 53 Nays 45 Excused 0 Not Voting 10 | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/14/2023 | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Introduced By Representative Jenn Hill |