Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill December 11, 2024
Bill June 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 18, 2024

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025