House
|
12/31/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 698 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/26/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 Yeas 57 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/18/2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Noah Arbit
|
|
|