Senate | 12/20/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 699 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 11/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 Yeas 57 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/18/2024 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Introduced By Representative Kristian Grant |