Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 20, 2024
Bill November 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 22, 2025