House
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 94'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 11:56 Am
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 09:56 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:26 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Reassigned To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 80 Nays 27 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Substitute (h-3) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/21/2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Alabas Farhat
|
|
|