Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5460 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2024

Engrossed

Bill June 26, 2024
Bill May 23, 2024

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2024