House | 05/22/2024 | Roll Call Roll Call # 130 Yeas 51 Nays 55 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Senate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 187 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 75 Yeas 56 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/22/2024 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Introduced By Representative Phil Skaggs |