House | 12/12/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 12/11/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 496 Yeas 29 Nays 7 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/11/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/11/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 11/26/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 11/26/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 223 Yeas 84 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/22/2024 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Introduced By Representative Carol Glanville |