Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 11, 2024
Bill June 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 18, 2024

Chaptered

Bill January 17, 2025