House
|
05/22/2024
|
Assigned Pa 47'24
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 05/22/2024 01:52 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 05/22/2024 11:10 Am
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 05/15/2024 10:44 Am
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 78 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Postponed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 41 Yeas 53 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 100 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 33 Yeas 58 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/05/2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Kelly Breen
|
|
|