Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 22, 2024