House
|
11/13/2024
|
Assigned Pa 153'24
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/13/2024 01:30 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 11/13/2024 11:40 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 11/12/2024 11:16 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 10/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 377 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 Yeas 68 Nays 41 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/12/2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Kristian Grant
|
|
|