Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5557 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill October 23, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024

Enrolled

Bill November 5, 2024

Chaptered

Bill November 14, 2024