House
|
11/13/2024
|
Assigned Pa 155'24
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/13/2024 01:34 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 11/13/2024 11:44 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 11/12/2024 11:14 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 10/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/23/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 379 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 175 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/20/2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Tullio Liberati
|
|
|