Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 20, 2024

Engrossed

Bill October 28, 2024
Bill June 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill November 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis December 10, 2024

Chaptered

Bill November 14, 2024