House | 12/31/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 12/31/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
House | 12/23/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 707 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 12/20/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 Yeas 89 Nays 19 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/24/2024 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Referred To Committee On Education | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Introduced By Representative Luke Meerman |