LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Michigan MI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB5659
Draft Versions
MI
Michigan House Bill HB5659
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session
Michigan House Bill HB5659
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
April 24, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
December 20, 2024
Compare
Bill
December 10, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
January 8, 2025
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
January 22, 2025
Compare
Bill
January 22, 2025
Compare