House
|
12/31/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 725 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 445 Yeas 69 Nays 40 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/30/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Mike Mcfall
|
|
|