Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5695 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 30, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 20, 2024
Bill December 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill January 8, 2025

Chaptered

Bill January 22, 2025