House
|
12/10/2024
|
Assigned Pa 166'24
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/10/2024 11:25 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 12/10/2024 10:40 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 12/06/2024 03:08 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 425 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/26/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/26/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/02/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 323 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/07/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Amos O'neal
|
|
|