Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5717 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 7, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 4, 2024
Bill September 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 6, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 10, 2024