Senate | 07/30/2024 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 Yeas 60 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/14/2024 | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Introduced By Representative Mike Mcfall |