House
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 96'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 12:00 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 07/23/2024 10:00 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 07/11/2024 01:24 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 313 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Agriculture
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 152 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted And Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/22/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Abraham Aiyash
|
|
|