Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5737 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill June 26, 2024
Bill June 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2024