House | 12/10/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 471 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 Yeas 99 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/11/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/28/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2024 | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Introduced By Representative Jenn Hill |