Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5747 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 23, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 10, 2024
Bill June 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 18, 2024

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025