House | 10/15/2024 | Assigned Pa 126'24 | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/03/2024 03:04 Pm | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Approved By The Governor 10/03/2024 02:14 Pm | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Presented To The Governor 10/02/2024 03:10 Pm | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 09/25/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 344 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 09/25/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 09/25/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 208 Yeas 56 Nays 25 Excused 0 Not Voting 29 | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/18/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/18/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 06/06/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/05/2024 | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/05/2024 | Introduced By Representative Jaime Churches |