Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5779 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill September 25, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024

Enrolled

Bill October 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2024