Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 451 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2024 | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Referred To Committee On Elections | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/12/2024 | Introduced By Representative Penelope Tsernoglou |