House
|
12/10/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 401 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 424 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 Yeas 58 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2024
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/18/2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2024
|
Introduced By Representative Mai Xiong
|
|
|