Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5826 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 3, 2024
Bill June 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 18, 2024

Chaptered

Bill January 21, 2025