Senate | 12/18/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 Yeas 91 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/04/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 07/30/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/27/2024 | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Introduced By Representative Rachel Hood |