House | 12/10/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 12/10/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 469 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 10/02/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 321 Yeas 96 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 09/24/2024 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | ||
House | 09/17/2024 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/11/2024 | ||
House | 09/11/2024 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 09/11/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 09/11/2024 | Introduced By Representative Jaime Greene |