Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB5922 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 11, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 10, 2024
Bill September 25, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 18, 2024

Chaptered

Bill January 17, 2025