Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0044'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 06/13/2023 11:07 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Approved By Governor 06/13/2023 10:02 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Presented To Governor 06/12/2023 12:01 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 322 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 118 Yeas 103 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Received On 03/09/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 52 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana
|
|
|