LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Michigan MI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB0032
Draft Versions
MI
Michigan Senate Bill SB0032
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session
Michigan Senate Bill SB0032
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 19, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
May 18, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 9, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
June 12, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 13, 2023
Chaptered
Bill
June 13, 2023
Compare