Senate | 04/11/2023 | Assigned Pa 0008'23 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/24/2023 01:02 Pm | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Approved By Governor 03/24/2023 09:32 Am | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Presented To Governor 03/23/2023 11:32 Am | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 100 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 34 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Received On 03/15/2023 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred To Committee On Labor | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 60 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri |