Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0034 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 23, 2023

Chaptered

Bill March 24, 2023