Senate | 03/12/2024 | Assigned Pa 0019'24 With Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/12/2024 11:30 Am | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Approved By Governor 03/12/2024 10:16 Am | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Presented To Governor 03/05/2024 01:52 Pm | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Given Immediate Effect | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 Yeas 88 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Received On 10/18/2023 | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 538 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Introduced By Senator Joseph Bellino |