LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Michigan MI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB0058
Draft Versions
MI
Michigan Senate Bill SB0058
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session
Michigan Senate Bill SB0058
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 7, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 27, 2024
Compare
Bill
October 18, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
March 5, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
March 17, 2024
Chaptered
Bill
March 14, 2024
Compare