Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0056'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/12/2023 10:04 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Approved By Governor 07/11/2023 12:32 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To Governor 07/06/2023 02:24 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 228 Yeas 104 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Health Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Received On 04/19/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 124 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Introduced By Senator John Cherry
|
|
|