Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0059 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 27, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2023